House | 04/19/2021 | No Action | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | File Number 153 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | House Calendar Number 142 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |