House
|
06/01/2021
|
File Number 769
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 528
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 9503
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 9485
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8723
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Referred by House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
File Number 30
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
House Calendar Number 60
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|