House | 04/08/2021 | File Number 341 | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | House Calendar Number 257 | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |