Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Public Act 21-132
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
File Number 777
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 539
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9688
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
File Number 302
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
House Calendar Number 234
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|