Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06417 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 27, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 16, 2021