House | 04/14/2021 | No Action | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Environment | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | File Number 73 | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | House Calendar Number 92 | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |