House | 04/21/2021 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | File Number 87 | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | House Calendar Number 98 | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |