House | 05/10/2021 | File Number 641 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | House Calendar Number 463 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/16/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/16/2021 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |