House | 04/26/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | File Number 236 | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | House Calendar Number 197 | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/19/2021 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |