House | 05/10/2021 | File Number 638 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | House Calendar Number 464 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Public Hearing 03/24 | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |