House | 04/26/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | File Number 263 | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | House Calendar Number 217 | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |