Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06457 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 5, 2021
Fiscal Note June 4, 2021
Fiscal Note June 3, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Bill February 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis July 21, 2021
Analysis June 5, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2021