House | 06/28/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/18/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/18/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/16/2021 | Public Act 21-85 | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/21/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 469 | ||
House | 05/21/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | File Number 595 | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | House Calendar Number 417 | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |