House | 03/11/2021 | File Number 46 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | House Calendar Number 65 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |