Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06465 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/16/2021

                                
 
 
LCO No. 3424  	1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6465  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 3424 
 
 
Referred to Committee on JUDICIARY  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(JUD)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E REDUCTION OF ECONO MIC DAMAGES 
IN A PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH ACTIO N FOR 
COLLATERAL SOURCE PA YMENTS MADE ON BEHAL F OF A 
CLAIMANT. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 52-225a of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2021): 2 
(a) In any civil action, whether in tort or in contract, wherein (1) the 3 
claimant seeks to recover damages resulting from [(1)] personal injury 4 
or wrongful death, [occurring on or after October 1, 1987, or (2) personal 5 
injury or wrongful death, arising out of the rendition of professional 6 
services by a health care provider, occurring on or after October 1, 1985, 7 
and prior to October 1, 1986, if the action was filed on or after October 8 
1, 1987, and wherein] and (2) liability is admitted or is determined by 9 
the trier of fact and damages are awarded to compensate the claimant, 10 
the court shall reduce the amount of such award which represents 11 
economic damages, as defined in subdivision (1) of subsection (a) of 12 
section 52-572h, by an amount equal to the total of amounts determined 13 
to have been paid under subsection (b) of this section less the total of 14  Raised Bill No.  6465 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3424   	2 of 3 
 
amounts determined to have been paid, contributed or forfeited under 15 
subsection (c) of this section, except that there shall be no reduction for 16 
[(A) a collateral source for which a right of subrogation exists, and (B) 17 
the amount] the amount (A) subject to a right of subrogation, (B) agreed 18 
upon in full satisfaction of any right of subrogation, (C) to which a right 19 
of subrogation has not been waived, limited or extinguished, or (D) of 20 
collateral sources equal to the reduction in the claimant's economic 21 
damages attributable to the claimant's percentage of negligence 22 
pursuant to section 52-572h. 23 
(b) Upon a finding of liability and an awarding of damages by the 24 
trier of fact and before the court enters judgment, the court shall receive 25 
evidence from the claimant and other appropriate persons concerning 26 
the total amount: [of] (1) Of collateral sources which have been paid for 27 
the benefit of the claimant as of the date the court enters judgment, (2) 28 
subject to a right of subrogation, (3) agreed upon in full satisfaction of a 29 
right of subrogation, and (4) to which a right of subrogation has not been 30 
waived, limited or extinguished. For purposes of this subsection, 31 
evidence that a physician or physician assistant, dentist, chiropractor, 32 
naturopath, physical therapist, podiatrist, psychologist, social worker, 33 
mental health professional, an emergency medical technician, 34 
optometrist, or advanced practice registered nurse, accepted an amount 35 
less than the total amount of any bill generated by such physician, 36 
physician assistant, dentist, chiropractor, naturopath, physical 37 
therapist, podiatrist, psychologist, social worker, mental health 38 
professional, emergency medical technician, optometrist or advanced 39 
practice registered nurse, or evidence that an insurer paid less than the 40 
total amount of any bill generated by such physician, physician 41 
assistant, dentist, chiropractor, naturopath, physical therapist, 42 
podiatrist, psychologist, social worker, mental health professional, 43 
emergency medical technician, optometrist or advanced practice 44 
registered nurse, shall be admissible as evidence of the total amount of 45 
collateral sources which have been paid for the benefit of the claimant 46 
as of the date the court enters judgment. 47 
(c) The court shall receive evidence from the claimant and any other 48  Raised Bill No.  6465 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3424   	3 of 3 
 
appropriate person concerning any amount which has been paid, 49 
contributed or forfeited, as of the date the court enters judgment, by, or 50 
on behalf of, the claimant or members of his immediate family to secure 51 
his right to any collateral source benefit which he has received as a result 52 
of such injury or death.  53 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2021 52-225a 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To permit a post-verdict collateral source reduction in damages in 
certain personal injury or wrongful death matters involving a right of 
subrogation. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]