Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06466 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Bill February 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 6, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2021