Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06469 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-LCO 3477 \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06469-R02-
3+LCO 3477 \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06469-R01-
44 HB.docx
55 1 of 3
66
77 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 6469
88 January Session, 2021
9+LCO No. 3477
910
1011
1112 Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES
1213
1314
1415 Introduced by:
1516 (HS)
1617
1718
1819
1920 AN ACT CONCERNING TH E CONNECTICUT HOME -CARE PROGRAM
2021 FOR THE ELDERLY.
2122 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
2223 Assembly convened:
2324
2425 Section 1. Subsections (i) and (j) of section 17b-342 of the general 1
2526 statutes are repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof 2
2627 (Effective July 1, 2021): 3
2728 (i) (1) On and after July 1, 2015, the Commissioner of Social Services 4
2829 shall, within available appropriations, administer a state-funded 5
2930 portion of the program for persons (A) who are sixty-five years of age 6
3031 and older; (B) who are inappropriately institutionalized or at risk of 7
3132 inappropriate institutionalization; (C) whose income is less than or 8
3233 equal to the amount allowed under subdivision (3) of subsection (a) of 9
3334 this section; and (D) whose assets, if single, do not exceed one hundred 10
3435 fifty per cent of the federal minimum community spouse protected 11
3536 amount pursuant to 42 USC 1396r-5(f)(2) or, if married, the couple's 12
3637 assets do not exceed two hundred per cent of said community spouse 13
37-protected amount. For program applications received by the 14 Raised Bill No. 6469
38+protected amount. For program applications received by the 14
39+Department of Social Services for the fiscal years ending June 30, 2016, 15 Raised Bill No. 6469
3840
3941
4042 LCO 3477 {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06469-
41-R02-HB.docx }
43+R01-HB.docx }
4244 2 of 3
4345
44-Department of Social Services for the fiscal years ending June 30, 2016, 15
4546 and June 30, 2017, only persons who require the level of care provided 16
4647 in a nursing home shall be eligible for the state-funded portion of the 17
4748 program, except for persons residing in affordable housing under the 18
4849 assisted living demonstration project established pursuant to section 19
4950 17b-347e who are otherwise eligible in accordance with this section. 20
5051 [(2) Except for persons residing in affordable housing under the 21
5152 assisted living demonstration project established pursuant to section 22
5253 17b-347e, as provided in subdivision (3) of this subsection, any person 23
5354 whose income is at or below two hundred per cent of the federal poverty 24
5455 level and who is ineligible for Medicaid shall contribute nine per cent of 25
5556 the cost of his or her care. Any person whose income exceeds two 26
5657 hundred per cent of the federal poverty level shall contribute nine per 27
5758 cent of the cost of his or her care in addition to the amount of applied 28
5859 income determined in accordance with the methodology established by 29
5960 the Department of Social Services for recipients of medical assistance. 30
6061 Any person who does not contribute to the cost of care in accordance 31
6162 with this subdivision shall be ineligible to receive services under this 32
6263 subsection. Notwithstanding any provision of sections 17b-60 and 17b-33
6364 61, the department shall not be required to provide an administrative 34
6465 hearing to a person found ineligible for services under this subsection 35
6566 because of a failure to contribute to the cost of care. 36
6667 (3) Any person who resides in affordable housing under the assisted 37
6768 living demonstration project established pursuant to section 17b-347e 38
6869 and whose income is at or below two hundred per cent of the federal 39
6970 poverty level, shall not be required to contribute to the cost of care. Any 40
7071 person who resides in affordable housing under the assisted living 41
7172 demonstration project established pursuant to section 17b-347e and 42
7273 whose income exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal poverty 43
7374 level, shall contribute to the applied income amount determined in 44
7475 accordance with the methodology established by the Department of 45
7576 Social Services for recipients of medical assistance. Any person whose 46
76-income exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal poverty level and 47 Raised Bill No. 6469
77+income exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal poverty level and 47
78+who does not contribute to the cost of care in accordance with this 48 Raised Bill No. 6469
7779
7880
7981 LCO 3477 {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06469-
80-R02-HB.docx }
81-3 of 4
82+R01-HB.docx }
83+3 of 3
8284
83-who does not contribute to the cost of care in accordance with this 48
8485 subdivision shall be ineligible to receive services under this subsection. 49
8586 Notwithstanding any provision of sections 17b-60 and 17b-61, the 50
8687 department shall not be required to provide an administrative hearing 51
8788 to a person found ineligible for services under this subsection because 52
8889 of a failure to contribute to the cost of care.] 53
8990 [(4)] (2) The annualized cost of services provided to an individual 54
9091 under the state-funded portion of the program shall not exceed fifty per 55
9192 cent of the weighted average cost of care in nursing homes in the state, 56
9293 except an individual who received services costing in excess of such 57
9394 amount under the Department of Social Services in the fiscal year 58
9495 ending June 30, 1992, may continue to receive such services, provided 59
9596 the annualized cost of such services does not exceed eighty per cent of 60
9697 the weighted average cost of such nursing home care. The commissioner 61
9798 may allow the cost of services provided to an individual to exceed the 62
9899 maximum cost established pursuant to this subdivision in a case of 63
99100 extreme hardship, as determined by the commissioner, provided in no 64
100101 case shall such cost exceed that of the weighted cost of such nursing 65
101102 home care. 66
102103 (j) The Commissioner of Social Services may implement revised 67
103104 criteria for the operation of the program while in the process of adopting 68
104105 such criteria in regulation form, provided the commissioner prints 69
105106 notice of intention to adopt the regulations [in the Connecticut Law 70
106107 Journal within twenty days of implementing the policy] in accordance 71
107108 with section 17b-10. Such criteria shall be valid until the time final 72
108109 regulations are effective. 73
109110 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
110111 sections:
111112
112113 Section 1 July 1, 2021 17b-342(i) and (j)
113114
114-HS Joint Favorable Raised Bill No. 6469
115-
116-
117-LCO 3477 {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06469-
118-R02-HB.docx }
119-4 of 4
120-
121-APP Joint Favorable
115+HS Joint Favorable
122116