House | 05/14/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 438 | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | File Number 388 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | House Calendar Number 301 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |