House | 03/30/2021 | File Number 204 | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | House Calendar Number 175 | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |