House | 06/28/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/21/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/21/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/18/2021 | Public Act 21-112 | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 371 | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | File Number 239 | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | House Calendar Number 200 | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/19/2021 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |