House | 04/01/2021 | File Number 240 | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | House Calendar Number 201 | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/19/2021 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |