House | 05/20/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 446 | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | File Number 124 | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | House Calendar Number 123 | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/19/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |