Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06491 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Bill February 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis September 7, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 3, 2021