Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06492 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2021

                     
 
LCO 3672  \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06492-R01-
HB.docx  
1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6492  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 3672 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PH)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ED UCATION AND TRAINING IN EXERTIONAL 
HEAT ILLNESS FOR COA CHES, PARENTS, GUARD IANS AND 
STUDENTS.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) As used in this section: 1 
(1) "Exertional heat illness" means an illness resulting from engaging 2 
in physical activity in the heat, including, but not limited to, heat 3 
cramps, heat syncope, heat exhaustion and heat stroke; 4 
(2) "Heat cramps" means sudden or progressively and noticeably 5 
evolving, involuntary, painful contractions of skeletal muscle during or 6 
after engaging in physical activity in the heat; 7 
(3) "Heat exhaustion" means the inability to effectively engage in 8 
physical activity in the heat, secondary to a combination of factors, 9 
including, but not limited to, cardiovascular insufficiency, hypotension, 10 
energy depletion and central fatigue and is manifested by an elevated 11 
core body temperature and associated with a high rate or volume of skin 12 
blood flow, heavy sweating and dehydration; 13  Raised Bill No. 6492 
 
 
LCO 3672  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06492-
R01-HB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
(4) "Heat stroke" means a medical emergency characterized by 14 
neuropsychiatric impairment and a high core body temperature, 15 
typically 105.8° Fahrenheit or above; 16 
(5) "Heat syncope" means sudden dizziness, feeling faint and fainting 17 
experienced after engaging in physical activity in the heat; and 18 
(6) "Intramural or interscholastic athletics" shall include any activity 19 
sponsored by a school or local education agency, as defined in section 20 
10-15f of the general statutes, or an organization sanctioned by the local 21 
education agency that involves any athletic contest, practice, 22 
scrimmage, competition, demonstration, display or club activity. 23 
(b) For the school year commencing July 1, 2022, and each school year 24 
thereafter, any person who holds or is issued a coaching permit by the 25 
State Board of Education and is a coach of intramural or interscholastic 26 
athletics shall complete an exertional heat illness awareness education 27 
program prior to commencing the coaching assignment for the season 28 
of such intramural or interscholastic athletics. Such program shall be 29 
developed or approved pursuant to subsection (c) of this section. For the 30 
school year commencing July 1, 2022, and each school year thereafter, 31 
any person who holds or is issued a coaching permit by the State Board 32 
of Education and is a coach of intramural or interscholastic athletics 33 
shall annually review the program developed or approved pursuant to 34 
subsection (c) of this section, prior to commencing the coaching 35 
assignment for the season of such intramural or interscholastic athletics. 36 
(c) On or before January 1, 2022, the governing authority for 37 
intramural and interscholastic athletics, in consultation with an 38 
appropriate organization representing licensed athletic trainers, an 39 
organization representing sports medical doctors, an organization that 40 
researches best practices in managing heat illness, and an organization 41 
representing county medical associations, shall develop or approve an 42 
exertional heat illness awareness education program for use by local and 43 
regional boards of education. Such program shall be published on the 44 
State Board of Education's Internet web site and shall include, but need 45  Raised Bill No. 6492 
 
 
LCO 3672  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06492-
R01-HB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
not be limited to, (1) the recognition of the symptoms of an exertional 46 
heat illness, (2) the means of obtaining proper medical treatment for a 47 
person suspected of having an exertional heat illness, and (3) the nature 48 
and risk of exertional heat illness, including the danger of continuing to 49 
engage in athletic activity after sustaining exertional heat illness and the 50 
proper method of allowing a student athlete who has sustained 51 
exertional heat illness to return to athletic activity. 52 
(d) On or before October 1, 2022, and annually thereafter, the 53 
governing authority for intramural and interscholastic athletics, in 54 
consultation with an appropriate organization representing licensed 55 
athletic trainers, an organization representing sports medical doctors, 56 
an organization that researches best practices in managing heat illness 57 
and an organization representing county medical associations, shall 58 
develop or approve annual review materials regarding current and 59 
relevant information regarding exertional heat illness for use by local 60 
and regional boards of education. 61 
(e) On or before January 1, 2022, the governing authority for 62 
intramural and interscholastic athletics, in consultation with an 63 
appropriate organization representing licensed athletic trainers, an 64 
organization representing sports medical doctors, an organization that 65 
researches best practices in managing heat illness and an organization 66 
representing county medical associations, shall develop a model 67 
exertional heat illness awareness plan for use by local and regional 68 
boards of education. Each local and regional board of education shall 69 
implement such plan by utilizing written materials, online training or 70 
videos or in-person training that shall address, at a minimum: (1) The 71 
recognition of signs or symptoms of exertional heat illness, (2) the means 72 
of obtaining proper medical treatment for a person suspected of an 73 
exertional heat illness, (3) the nature and risks of exertional heat illness, 74 
including the danger of continuing to engage in athletic activity after 75 
experiencing exertional heat illness, (4) the proper procedures for 76 
allowing a student athlete who has experienced exertional heat illness 77 
to return to athletic activity, and (5) best practices in the prevention and 78  Raised Bill No. 6492 
 
 
LCO 3672  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06492-
R01-HB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
treatment of exertional heat illness. 79 
(f) For the school year commencing July 1, 2022, and each school year 80 
thereafter, each local and regional board of education shall prohibit a 81 
student athlete from participating in any intramural or interscholastic 82 
activity unless the student athlete, and a parent or guardian of such 83 
student athlete, (1) reads written materials, (2) views online training or 84 
videos, or (3) attends in-person training developed or approved 85 
pursuant to this section. Acknowledgment of adherence to this standard 86 
by the student athlete and the parent or guardian shall be made by the 87 
parent's or guardian's signature on an athletic participation informed 88 
consent form issued by the applicable local or regional board of 89 
education. 90 
(g) The State Board of Education may revoke the coaching permit, in 91 
accordance with the provisions of subsection (i) of section 10-145b of the 92 
general statutes, of any coach found to be in violation of this section. 93 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
PH Joint Favorable