Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06492 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/01/2021

                     
Researcher: ND 	Page 1 	4/1/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6492  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN 
EXERTIONAL HEAT ILLNESS FOR COACHES, PARENTS, 
GUARDIANS AND STUDENTS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires any person with a State Board of Education (SBE) 
coaching permit who coaches intramural or interscholastic athletics to 
complete an exertional heat illness awareness education program. 
They must do this before beginning their coaching assignment for the 
season and then review the program annually before the start of each 
coaching season. It authorizes SBE to revoke the permits of coaches 
who do not comply with the requirement, which begins in the 2022-23 
school year.  
The education program must be developed or approved by January 
1, 2022, by the intramural and interscholastic athletics governing 
authority, which is the Connecticut Interscholastic Athletic Conference 
(CIAC), in consultation with specified organizations. SBE must then 
publish the plan on its website.   
In addition to the program, CIAC must also develop for school 
board use: 
1. review materials on current and relevant exertional heat illness 
information annually, starting by October 1, 2022, and  
2. a model exertional heat illness awareness plan, by January 1, 
2022. 
The bill also requires school boards to implement the model plan 
using written materials, videos, or online or in-person training. 
Starting with the 2022-23 school year, the bill requires school boards to 
prohibit a student athlete from participating in intramural or  2021HB-06492-R000241-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 2 	4/1/21 
 
interscholastic athletics unless the student and his or her parent or 
guardian reads or views the training materials or attends an in-person 
training. The parent or guardian must sign an athletic participation 
informed consent form issued by the school board that acknowledges 
compliance with the requirement.  
Under the bill, an “exertional heat illness” means an illness resulting 
from engaging in physical activity in the heat, including heat cramps, 
heat syncope (i.e., sudden dizziness, feeling faint, and fainting), heat 
exhaustion, and heat stroke (i.e., neuropsychiatric impairment and a 
high body temperature, typically 105.8 degrees or higher).  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021 
EXERTIONAL HEAT ILLN ESS AWARENESS EDUCAT ION 
PROGRAM AND MODEL PL AN 
Program Development and Content 
Under the bill, CIAC must develop or approve the exertional heat 
awareness education program by January 1, 2022, in consultation with 
specified organizations, one each of which must represent: (1) licensed 
athletic trainers, (2) sports medicine doctors, (3) researchers of best 
practices in managing heat illness, and (4) county medical associations.   
The program content must include: 
1. recognizing the symptoms of an exertional heat illness; 
2. how to obtain proper medical treatment for a person suspected 
of having the illness; 
3. the nature and risk of exertional heat illness, including the 
danger of continuing to engage in athletic activity after 
sustaining such an illness; and 
4. the proper method of allowing a student athlete who has 
sustained the illness to return to athletic activity.  
Model Plan Content 
The bill also requires these entities to develop a model exertional  2021HB-06492-R000241-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 3 	4/1/21 
 
heat illness awareness plan by January 1, 2022. The model plan must 
include the same components as the program above as well as best 
practices in preventing and treating exertional heat illness. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 33 Nay 0 (03/12/2021)