Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Public Act 21-88
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
File Number 783
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 547
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8796
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
File Number 230
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
House Calendar Number 191
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|