House | 05/04/2021 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | File Number 206 | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | House Calendar Number 177 | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |