House | 05/10/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 410 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | File Number 502 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | House Calendar Number 369 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |