House
|
07/12/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2021
|
Public Act 21-162
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
File Number 728
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 489
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8206
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
File Number 167
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
House Calendar Number 155
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|