House | 03/30/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |