House | 07/12/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/25/2021 | Public Act 21-169 | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 369 | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | File Number 473 | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | House Calendar Number 342 | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |