House | 06/09/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | File Number 627 | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 373 | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7497 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | File Number 173 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | House Calendar Number 161 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |