House | 03/29/2021 | File Number 174 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | House Calendar Number 162 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |