House
|
07/12/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2021
|
Public Act 21-171
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
File Number 774
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 527
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9463
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
File Number 646
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
House Calendar Number 465
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|