Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06558 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/10/2021

                    Analyst: ES  	Page 1 	5/10/21 
 
 
 
 
OFA Bill Analysis 
sHB 6558 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ISSUES RELATING TO THE PROVISION 
OF EARLY CHILDHOOD EDUCATION AND SERVICES IN 
CONNECTICUT. 
 
SUMMARY: 
The bill allows the Office of Early Childhood (OEC) to issue a family 
child care home license to provide care in a space outside a private 
family home from FY 22 through FY 26. The bill limits the issuance of 
the license to one facility per city in New Britain, New Haven, 
Bridgeport, Stamford, Hartford, or Waterbury. 
The bill also establishes a task force to analyze and make 
recommendations on issues related to early childhood workforce 
development needs in the state. The taskforce must report and 
terminate by January 1, 2023. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Education Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference - APP 
Yea 38 Nay 0 (03/15/2021) 
 
Appropriations Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 50 Nay 0 (04/21/2021)