House | 05/10/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 409 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | File Number 271 | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | House Calendar Number 225 | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |