House | 04/15/2021 | File Number 475 | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | House Calendar Number 344 | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |