House | 04/20/2021 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | File Number 308 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | House Calendar Number 240 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |