Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Public Act 21-94
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
File Number 778
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 542
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9634
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
File Number 212
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
House Calendar Number 183
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|