House | 04/07/2021 | File Number 311 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | House Calendar Number 243 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |