Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06604 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/07/2021

                     
Researcher: TA 	Page 1 	4/7/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6604  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING REMOTE NOTARIAL ACTS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill allows notaries public and Superior Court commissioners 
(collectively, "notaries") to perform notarial acts electronically until 
June 30, 2022. (This provision codifies Executive Order 7Q (§ 3), which 
the governor issued on March 30, 2020, and subsequently extended for 
the duration of the declared public health and civil preparedness 
emergencies.) It requires notaries who do so to (1) use an electronic 
device or process that allows a notary and a remotely located 
individual to communicate with each other simultaneously by sight 
and sound and (2) comply with specified requirements. 
The bill also requires the Commerce Committee chairpersons to 
convene a working group to examine and make recommendations on 
whether (1) to adopt the Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts 
(RULONA, see BACKGROUND) and (2) remote notarization should 
be permitted with respect to real estate and trusts and estates 
transactions.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage 
REMOTE NOTARIZATION 
Current law does not permit remote notarization in Connecticut. For 
example, it defines "acknowledgement" as "a notarial act in which a 
notary public certifies that a signatory…has admitted, in the notary's 
presence, to having signed a document for its stated purpose" (CGS § 
3-94a(1)). 
The bill instead allows remote notarizations until June 30, 2022, 
subject to the following requirements: 
1. A signatory who is not personally known to the notary must  2021HB-06604-R000311-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: TA 	Page 2 	4/7/21 
 
present satisfactory evidence of identification while 
communicating with the notary and may not transmit it before 
or after the transaction (evidence of identification includes two 
specified forms of ID or an affirmation by a person known to 
both the notary and signatory). 
2. The electronic device or process must be capable of recording 
the complete notarial act. 
3. The notary must retain a recording of the complete notarial act 
for at least 10 years. 
4. The signatory must affirmatively represent that he or she is 
physically present in Connecticut during the transaction. 
5. The signatory must transmit to the notary, by fax or electronic 
means, a copy of the signed document on the same date it was 
executed. 
6. The notary may notarize the transmitted copy and send it back 
to the signatory by fax or electronic means. 
7. The notary may repeat the notarization of the original signed 
document as of its execution date as long as the notary receives 
the original signed document, together with the electronically 
notarized copy, within 30 days after the execution date. 
Under the bill, only an attorney in good standing and admitted to 
practice law in Connecticut may remotely administer a self-proving 
affidavit to a last will or conduct a real estate closing. The bill suspends 
all witness requirements for notarizations, except for those concerning 
a last will. It allows witnessing requirements for a last will to be 
satisfied remotely, using the communication technology described 
above, if a Superior Court commissioner (generally, an attorney 
admitted to the Connecticut bar and in good standing) supervises its 
completion and certifies his or her supervision. 
The bill requires town clerks to accept remotely notarized 
documents for recording on their town's land records. Remotely  2021HB-06604-R000311-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: TA 	Page 3 	4/7/21 
 
notarized documents submitted to the clerks for this purpose must be 
accompanied by a one-page certification confirming the use of remote 
notarization. 
WORKING GROUP 
The bill requires the Commerce Committee chairpersons to convene 
a working group to examine RULONA and recommend whether to 
adopt it. The group must also recommend whether remote 
notarization should be permitted for real estate and trusts and estates 
transactions. 
Under the bill, the working group must be co-chaired by the 
secretary of the state (or her designee) and a legislator who is an 
attorney with experience in real estate transactions. It must also 
include representatives of the following: (1) Commerce, Government 
Administration and Elections (GAE), and Judiciary committees; (2) 
judicial branch; (3) Office of the Secretary of the State; (4) State Library; 
(5) Connecticut Town Clerks Association; (6) Uniform Law 
Commission; (7) state or regional bar associations; (8) notary 
associations, and (9) title insurance and mortgage industries. 
The bill requires the chairpersons to schedule the group's first 
meeting, which must be held within 60 days after the bill's passage. 
The group must meet monthly thereafter until it submits its final 
report. The working group must report its findings and 
recommendations to the Commerce, GAE, and Judiciary committees 
by January 1, 2022. It terminates on this date or the date it submits its 
final report, whichever is later. 
BACKGROUND 
Related Bills 
SB 1074 and HB 6651, reported favorably by the GAE Committee, 
allow remote notarizations under similar conditions until December 
31, 2021. 
RULONA 
RULONA was approved by the National Conference of  2021HB-06604-R000311-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: TA 	Page 4 	4/7/21 
 
Commissioners on Uniform State Laws in July 2018. It establishes 
requirements for notaries public, notarial acts, and remote electronic 
notarizations, among other things. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Commerce Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 23 Nay 0 (03/22/2021)