House
|
07/13/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2021
|
Special Act 21-28
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
File Number 708
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 452
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8804
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
File Number 347
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
House Calendar Number 263
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|