Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Special Act 21-3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 139
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6080
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
File Number 116
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
House Calendar Number 125
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|