House | 04/29/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | File Number 543 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | House Calendar Number 387 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |