House | 06/24/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/16/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/16/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/15/2021 | Public Act 21-70 | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 454 | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | File Number 651 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | House Calendar Number 470 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |