Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06635 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021