Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06637 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis September 2, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 15, 2021