Senate | 06/07/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 580 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/07/2021 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/07/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10429 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | File Number 544 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | House Calendar Number 388 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |