Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06640 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Bill March 16, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 24, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021