Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06643 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Bill March 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 26, 2021
Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis May 26, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 15, 2021